IL SB3645 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0848
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0848
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services to establish and administer the Pat McGuire Child Welfare Education Fellowship Pilot Program to provide financial assistance to a diverse pool of eligible students (rather than to eligible students) who commit to seek and maintain employment at a purchase of service agency that contracts with the Department upon graduation from a participating institution with a degree in social work.
Title
DCFS-PAT MCGUIRE FELLOWSHIP
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0848 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 022-000-000 |
2022-03-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2022-03-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-02-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 014-000-000 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |