IL SB3640 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that ethylene oxide shall only be used to sterilize medical products, and only if the Environmental Protection Agency determines that there is no substitute sterilization technology available for sterilizing a particular medical product. Requires the Agency to prohibit all uses of ethylene oxide by January 1, 2022. Provides that the Agency shall not renew an air pollution operating permit if the Agency finds that the facility is emitting ethylene oxide at a level that violates any federal or State standards pertaining to ethylene oxide. Provides circumstances under which the Agency shall reopen and modify permits issued to facilities emitting ethylene oxide under the Clean Air Act Permit Program. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPA-ETHYLENE OXIDE BAN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-11-15SenateChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-11-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-11-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-11-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran
2018-11-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-11-07SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2018-11-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-11-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-11-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415539.5Amended CodeCitation Text
41559.16New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback