IL SB3640 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that ethylene oxide shall only be used to sterilize medical products, and only if the Environmental Protection Agency determines that there is no substitute sterilization technology available for sterilizing a particular medical product. Requires the Agency to prohibit all uses of ethylene oxide by January 1, 2022. Provides that the Agency shall not renew an air pollution operating permit if the Agency finds that the facility is emitting ethylene oxide at a level that violates any federal or State standards pertaining to ethylene oxide. Provides circumstances under which the Agency shall reopen and modify permits issued to facilities emitting ethylene oxide under the Clean Air Act Permit Program. Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-ETHYLENE OXIDE BAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-29 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-11-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-11-07 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2018-11-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-11-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 39.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 9.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |