IL SB3629 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0846
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0846
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Tow Notice Act. Provides that if a vehicle owner or other legally authorized person in control of a vehicle is under a written agreement permitting a vehicle to be parked on the property, the property owner or other person in lawful possession or control of the property, or his or her authorized agent, must provide personal notice to the vehicle owner or other legally authorized person in control of the vehicle prior to requesting that a commercial vehicle relocator remove the vehicle from the property. Requires the property owner or other person in lawful possession or control of the property, or his or her authorized agent, to make all reasonable efforts to provide the vehicle owner or other legally authorized person in control of a vehicle personal notice prior to removal of the vehicle. Requires that personal notice must be provided at least 3 hours prior to the removal of the vehicle. Provides that a vehicle owner or other legally authorized person in control of a vehicle that is aggrieved by a violation of the notice provisions may commence a civil action in the appropriate circuit court not later than 2 years after the date of the vehicle relocation and may recover from the property owner or other person in possession or control of the property, or his or her authorized agent, damages resulting from the violation, including, but not limited to: towing charges and storage charges accrued in connection with the relocated vehicle; loss of the vehicle; and costs and attorney's fees. Provides that the Act applies only to vehicles that are operable.
Title
TOWING/SALE NOTICE-VEH OWNER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0846 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-002-000 |
2022-03-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000 |
2022-03-17 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2022-03-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-012-000 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Murphy |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Murphy |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 11, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 009-002-000 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-001-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 019-000-000 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 4-203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
770 | 50 | 1.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
770 | 50 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |