IL SB3620 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act to provide that in the case of sexual assault or sexual abuse by school district personnel, nothing in the Act prohibits a school district from disclosing disciplinary records of school district personnel. Amends the School Code to require a school board to report all credible cases of sexual assault or sexual abuse by a licensed educator to the State Board of Education, to establish a hearing procedure for student victims, and to ensure that a licensed educator under investigation by the State Superintendent of Education is reassigned to non-classroom duty. Provides that, beginning with the 2018-2019 school year, the State Board of Education must monitor all fingerprint-based criminal history records checks and any other database checks conducted by a school district or regional superintendent for applicants for employment with a school district. Makes changes concerning educator licensure and allegations of physical or sexual abuse. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 to create the criminal offense of sexual conduct or sexual relations with a student by an authority figure. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 to require an arresting enforcement agency to share its reports pertaining to the arrest of a licensed educator with the superintendent of any school district that employs the educator (or, in the case of the arrest of a superintendent, with the school board of any school district that employs the superintendent). Amends the Personnel Record Review Act to provide that the Act does not prohibit a school district from divulging internal investigative findings and discipline to another school district. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SEXUAL ASSAULT/ABUSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-29 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-07 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-06-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-21.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-84b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 5 | 11-9.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
725 | 5 | 107-17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 40 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3620&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3620.htm |