IL SB3618 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-21 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-21 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Invest in Kids Act. Provides that students who are eligible to attend a qualifying pre-kindergarten school are also considered eligible students under the Act. Provides that the credit shall be equal to 100% (currently, 75%) of the total amount of qualified contributions made by the taxpayer during a taxable year. Removes a limitation that contributions may not be directed to a particular subset of schools, a particular school, a particular group of students, or a particular student. Provides that applications for scholarships for eligible students who received a scholarship from a scholarship granting organization during the previous school year shall be considered for re-application for the current school year and shall be considered received on the first day that the scholarship granting organization begins granting scholarships. Provides that the Act applies on a permanent basis. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-INVEST IN KIDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 40 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 40 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 40 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 40 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3618&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB3618.htm |