IL SB3618 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Authorizes the Department to enter into contracts to provide feeder services to and from rail terminals and intercity bus transportation. Defines terms. Provides that the Department may provide funding to Amtrak to enter into contracts with motor carriers for intercity transportation if certain conditions are met. Specifies that the first inter-city bus routes the Department coordinates shall be Quincy-Springfield-Decatur-Champaign-Danville and Quad Cities-Galesburg-Peoria-Normal-Champaign-Danville. Effective immediately.
Title
IDOT-INTERMODAL TRANSPORTATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-29 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2012-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2012-03-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2012 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |