IL SB3611 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes appropriations and reappropriations for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2018. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$FY19 CAPITAL QUINCY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback