IL SB3610 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $5,400,000 from the Common School Fund to the State Board of Education for the purpose of providing one-time, per capita grants to alternative schools, safe schools, or alternative learning opportunity programs that have experienced average daily attendance growth from Fiscal Year 2017. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$SUPP-STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-05-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback