IL SB3604 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-5)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Government Severance Pay Act. Provides that a unit of government that enters into a contract or employment agreement, or renewal or renegotiation of an existing contract or employment agreement, that contains a provision for severance pay with an officer, agent, employee, or contractor must include specified provisions in the contract. Provides that nothing in the Act creates an entitlement to severance pay in the absence of its contractual authorization or as otherwise authorized by law. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVERNMENT SEVERANCE PAY ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-29SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-001-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateDo Pass Government Reform; 007-000-000
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-04-24SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-23SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2018-04-23SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback