IL SB3601 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. In provisions concerning the Community Care Program, provides that within 30 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, rates for adult days services shall be increased to $15.02 per hour and rates for each way transportation services for adult day services shall be increased to $10.30. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AGING-ADULT DAY SERVICES RATES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-04SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
201054.02Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback