IL SB3596 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Limited Liability Company Act. Reduces the filing fees for a limited liability company filing articles of organization (domestic), application for admission (foreign), restated articles of organization (domestic), or an application for reinstatement (foreign or domestic) with the Secretary of State from $500 to $250. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LLC-SOS-ARTICLES FEES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08SenateSession Sine Die
2012-03-30SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2012-03-09SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 30, 2012
2012-03-01SenateTo Revenue Subcommittee on Special Issues
2012-02-22SenateAssigned to Revenue
2012-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2012-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2012-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Carole Pankau

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
80518050-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback