IL SB3591 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Biometric Information Privacy Act. Deletes language that a prevailing party may recover damages against a private entity that negligently violates the Act for each violation of the Act. Provides instead that a prevailing party may recover liquidated damages of $1,000 or actual damages, whichever is greater, and that such damages for a negligent violation by a private entity shall be recovered only for a single collection of each aggrieved party's biometric identifier or biometric information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BIPA-NEGLIGENT VIOLATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
2020-05-07SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020
2020-05-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020
2020-04-30SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020
2020-04-30SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020
2020-04-23SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020
2020-04-23SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020
2020-04-16SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020
2020-04-12SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2020-03-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020
2020-03-25SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020
2020-03-18SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020
2020-03-03SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2020-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2020-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2020-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7401420Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback