IL SB3577 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-24 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Electric Service Customer Choice and Rate Relief Law Of 1997 of the Public Utilities Act. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission shall grant the application for a certificate of service authority if it finds, among other findings, that the applicant discloses any formal complaints that seek a binding determination from a state or federal regulatory body and verifies that a complaint should not be a basis for denying the certificate of service authority. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission shall conduct at least one compliance education training meeting annually for certain alternative retail electric suppliers to discuss regulatory requirements, complaint statistics, and other information determined necessary by the Commission. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UTILITIES-ELECTRIC SERVICE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 010-000-000
2018-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 009-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220516-115Amended CodeCitation Text
220516-115BAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback