IL SB3577 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Electric Service Customer Choice and Rate Relief Law Of 1997 of the Public Utilities Act. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission shall grant the application for a certificate of service authority if it finds, among other findings, that the applicant discloses any formal complaints that seek a binding determination from a state or federal regulatory body and verifies that a complaint should not be a basis for denying the certificate of service authority. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission shall conduct at least one compliance education training meeting annually for certain alternative retail electric suppliers to discuss regulatory requirements, complaint statistics, and other information determined necessary by the Commission. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITIES-ELECTRIC SERVICE
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Chris Nybo [R] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 16-115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-115B | Amended Code | Citation Text |