IL SB3574 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Energy Transition Zone Act. Provides for the certification by the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity of municipal ordinances designating an area as an Energy Transition Zone. Provides that green energy enterprises located in Energy Transition Zones shall be eligible to apply for certain tax incentives. Provides that a green energy enterprise is a company that is engaged in the production of solar energy, wind energy, water energy, geothermal energy, bioenergy, or hydrogen fuel and cells. Contains provisions concerning qualifications and applications. Creates the Energy Transition Tax Credit Act. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall make income tax credit awards under the Act to foster job creation and the development of green energy in Energy Transition Zones. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, and the Public Utilities Act to make conforming changes concerning tax incentives. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REVENUE-GREEN ENERGY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22059-221Amended CodeCitation Text
22059-222Amended CodeCitation Text
22059-222.1BNew CodeSee Bill Text
301055.886New CodeSee Bill Text
351205k-1New CodeSee Bill Text
355201Amended CodeCitation Text
51005-45Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback