IL SB3574 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1029
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that persons that purchase a new motor vehicle with a gross vehicle weight rating of 33,000 pounds or more that uses natural gas as a motor fuel are entitled to an income tax credit equal to the lesser of $18,000 or half the difference between the purchase price of the natural gas vehicle and a similarly equipped gasoline or diesel vehicle of the same make and model. Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that motor carriers that employ natural gas vehicles are entitled to a refund on taxes paid under the Motor Fuel Tax Law equal to 12% of the taxes paid on the purchase of natural gas. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the weight limitations on motor vehicles are increased by 2,000 pounds for vehicles that use natural gas as a motor fuel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NATURAL GAS VEHICLES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-22SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1029
2014-08-22SenateEffective Date January 1, 2015
2014-08-22SenateGovernor Approved
2014-06-27SenateSent to the Governor
2014-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2014-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
2014-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2014-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 015-000-000
2014-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation
2014-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2014-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2014-05-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2014
2014-05-28SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2014-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2014-05-23HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014
2014-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2014-05-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2014-05-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2014-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2014-05-13HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 015-000-000
2014-05-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; by Voice Vote
2014-05-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2014-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2014-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2014-05-05HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2014-04-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2014-04-10HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
2014-04-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2014-04-09HouseFirst Reading
2014-04-09HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2014-04-09HouseArrived in House
2014-04-09SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2014-04-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2014
2014-04-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Sandoval
2014-04-08SenateSecond Reading
2014-04-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 008-000-000
2014-04-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2014-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2014-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2014-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2014
2014-03-27SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 011-000-000
2014-03-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2014-03-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2014-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2014-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2014-03-05SenateAssigned to Revenue
2014-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2014-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2014-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355201Amended CodeCitation Text
3550513a.3Amended CodeCitation Text
625515-111Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3574&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3574.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3574sam001.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3574sam002.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3574eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3574ham001.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3574enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/98/098-1029.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/98/senate/09800SB3574_04092014_021000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/98/house/09800SB3574_05272014_025000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/98/senate/09800SB3574_05302014_067000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback