IL SB3569 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. Provides that the Board of Higher Education may not limit the amount of tuition revenue that a public university may waive. Repeals provisions regarding tuition waiver limitations in various Acts relating to the governance of public universities in Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-TUITION WAIVER LIMIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 010-000-000
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education
2018-05-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2018-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-16SenateRe-assigned to Higher Education
2018-05-16SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1102059.37New CodeSee Bill Text
1103057fAmended CodeCitation Text
1103057gRepealed CodeCitation Text
1105208fAmended CodeCitation Text
1105208gRepealed CodeCitation Text
1106605-90Amended CodeCitation Text
1106605-91Repealed CodeCitation Text
11066510-90Amended CodeCitation Text
11066510-91Repealed CodeCitation Text
11066510-92Repealed CodeCitation Text
11067015-90Amended CodeCitation Text
11067015-91Repealed CodeCitation Text
11067520-90Amended CodeCitation Text
11067520-91Repealed CodeCitation Text
11068025-90Amended CodeCitation Text
11068025-91Repealed CodeCitation Text
11068530-90Amended CodeCitation Text
11068530-91Repealed CodeCitation Text
11069035-90Amended CodeCitation Text
11069035-91Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback