IL SB3568 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the University of Illinois Act. Provides that notwithstanding any other provisions of law, the University may form one or more limited liability companies to own any current or future intellectual property attributable to the University pursuant to the Limited Liability Company Act. Requires the State to maintain a 51% ownership interest in any limited liability company formed. Allows the intellectual property to be held as a tenancy-in-common with all entities that hold an ownership interest in a company. Requires the payment of distributions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

U OF I-INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-21HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 010-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110305100New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback