IL SB3566 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. Requires the Board of Higher Education to establish a uniform admission process online, which must be used at all public institutions of higher education; sets forth what components this admission process must include. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
BD HIGHER ED-UNIFORM ADMISSION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Re-assigned to Higher Education |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |