IL SB3563 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Governmental Account Audit Act and the Public Library District Act of 1991. Provides that certain audits and financial reports of governmental units and public libraries shall be consistent with either the accrual or cash basis of accounting. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL GOV-AUDIT STANDARDS
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.25b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 22-28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 310 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 310 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 310 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
75 | 16 | 30-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
75 | 16 | 30-65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3563&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3563.htm |