IL SB3561 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0736
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0736
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Building Commission Act. Changes various repeal dates from June 1, 2018 to June 1, 2023 in provisions concerning allowing public building commissions to use the design-build delivery method for public projects. Makes conforming changes.
Title
BLDG COMMISSION-DESIGN-BUILD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0736 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 20 | 2.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 23.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |