IL SB3560 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Prompt Payment Act. Codifies the Vendor Payment Program established under the Illinois Administrative Code. Provides that any contract executed under that Program prior to June 30, 2018 shall remain in effect until those contracts have expired, and that existing contracts shall comply with the additional reporting requirements of this amendatory Act. Provides for the authority, applicability, and requirements for participants and entities involved in the Program established under this amendatory Act. Provides disclosure requirements for vendors under the Program. Requires the Auditor General to perform an annual audit of the Program. Requires the Department of Central Management Services to disclose specified information on its Internet website. Defines terms. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMPTROLLER-VENDOR PAYMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 006-002-000
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2018-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-007-000
2018-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Connor
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-22HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Connor
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-25HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John Connor
2018-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 044-001-000
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government; 007-001-000
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-04SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3054010New CodeSee Bill Text
3054011New CodeSee Bill Text
3054012New CodeSee Bill Text
305403-3.5New CodeSee Bill Text
305408New CodeSee Bill Text
305409New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3560&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3560.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3560eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3560enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3560sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3560ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3560ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3560_04242018_053000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB3560_05292018_014000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3560ham002_05312018_027000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback