IL SB3560 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Permits Article of the Size, Weight, Load and Permits Chapter of the Illinois Vehicle Code by providing that a municipality, township, county, or other unit of local government may not impose a fee for a permit in excess of the fees provided for in that Article.
Title
VEH CD-LOCAL GOVT-FEE LIMITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-23 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2010 | |
2010-03-26 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 15, 2010 | |
2010-03-19 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 26, 2010 | |
2010-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2010 | |
2010-03-12 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 4, 2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Do Pass Transportation; 007-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Transportation | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3560&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3560.htm |