IL SB3550 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Consumer Electronics Recycling Act. Provides that nothing in the Act shall prevent a manufacturer from accepting, through a manufacturer e-waste program, residential CEDs collected through a drop-off collection program that is operated pursuant to an agreement between a third party and a unit of local government located within a county or municipal joint action agency that has elected to participate in a manufacturer e-waste program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONSUMER ELECTRONICS RECYCLING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Environment
2018-05-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-10HouseArrived in House
2018-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2018
2018-05-03SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2018
2018-04-26SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000
2018-04-23SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-12SenatePostponed - Environment and Conservation
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2018-02-20SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4151511-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback