IL SB3550 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on December 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on December 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Electronics Recycling Act. Provides that nothing in the Act shall prevent a manufacturer from accepting, through a manufacturer e-waste program, residential CEDs collected through a drop-off collection program that is operated pursuant to an agreement between a third party and a unit of local government located within a county or municipal joint action agency that has elected to participate in a manufacturer e-waste program.
Title
CONSUMER ELECTRONICS RECYCLING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-15 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1165 |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Effective Date June 1, 2019 |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-12-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-11-15 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 046-000-000 |
2018-11-14 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000 |
2018-11-13 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Environment and Conservation |
2018-11-13 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-13 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-11-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 13, 2018 |
2018-11-07 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-11-07 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-09-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-07-08 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - June 7, 2018 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Environment; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment; 013-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-05-14 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2018-05-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 151 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |