IL SB3547 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Service-Member Employment and Reemployment Rights Act. Contains provisions concerning matters relevant to the employment rights of service-members, including employment protections, additional benefits for public employee members of a reserve component, prohibitions on discrimination, a notice of rights and duties, violations, enforcement, remedies, and rulemaking. Provides that the Attorney General shall appoint an Illinois Service-Member Employment and Reemployment Rights Act Advocate to carry out various duties related to the Act. Provides that in times of national or State emergency, the Governor may extend the protections of the Act. Limits the concurrent exercise of power by home rule units. Makes corresponding and related changes throughout the statutes. Repeals the Military Leave of Absence Act, the Public Employee Armed Services Rights Act, the Municipal Employees Military Active Duty Act, and the Local Government Employees Benefits Continuation Act. Amends the Service Member's Employment Tenure Act to change the short title to the Service Member's Tenure Act.
Title
SERVICE-MEMBER EMPLOYMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1101 |
2018-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 022-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; T. Cullerton |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Veterans Affairs |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Veterans Affairs |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Veterans Affairs |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Veterans Affairs |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1805 | 22-10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 30.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 30.10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 30.15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 30.20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 30.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | Art. V-A heading | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1815 | 79 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
330 | 60 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
330 | 60 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
330 | 60 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
330 | 60 | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
330 | 60 | 4.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
330 | 60 | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
330 | 60 | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
330 | 60 | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
330 | 60 | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
330 | 63 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 325 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 330 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
50 | 120 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
50 | 140 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3605 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3610 | 3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 17-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 6-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |