IL SB3547 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Service-Member Employment and Reemployment Rights Act. Contains provisions concerning matters relevant to the employment rights of service-members, including employment protections, additional benefits for public employee members of a reserve component, prohibitions on discrimination, a notice of rights and duties, violations, enforcement, remedies, and rulemaking. Provides that the Attorney General shall appoint an Illinois Service-Member Employment and Reemployment Rights Act Advocate to carry out various duties related to the Act. Provides that in times of national or State emergency, the Governor may extend the protections of the Act. Limits the concurrent exercise of power by home rule units. Makes corresponding and related changes throughout the statutes. Repeals the Military Leave of Absence Act, the Public Employee Armed Services Rights Act, the Municipal Employees Military Active Duty Act, and the Local Government Employees Benefits Continuation Act. Amends the Service Member's Employment Tenure Act to change the short title to the Service Member's Tenure Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SERVICE-MEMBER EMPLOYMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 022-000-000
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; T. Cullerton
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Veterans Affairs
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Veterans Affairs
2018-04-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Veterans Affairs
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20180522-10Repealed CodeCitation Text
20180530.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
20180530.10Repealed CodeCitation Text
20180530.15Repealed CodeCitation Text
20180530.20Repealed CodeCitation Text
20180530.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
201805Art. V-A headingAmended CodeCitation Text
20181579Repealed CodeCitation Text
330601Amended CodeCitation Text
330602Amended CodeCitation Text
330603Amended CodeCitation Text
330604Repealed CodeCitation Text
330604.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
330605Repealed CodeCitation Text
330606Repealed CodeCitation Text
330607Repealed CodeCitation Text
330608Repealed CodeCitation Text
3306310Amended CodeCitation Text
5325ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
5330ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
50120ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
50140ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
70360529Amended CodeCitation Text
7036103.5Amended CodeCitation Text
720517-6Amended CodeCitation Text
77556-102Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback