IL SB3543 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-07 - Assigned to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Department of Transportation, on behalf of the State of Illinois, to convey, by quitclaim deed, all right, title, and interest of the State of Illinois and the Department of Transportation in and to certain real estate to the Village of Bensenville. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDOT LAND TRANSFER-BENSENVILLE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-07HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
2018-05-02SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 012-000-000
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback