IL SB3536 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
Pending: House Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight Committee
Hearing: May 23 @ 9:00 am in Room 115
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2018, any publicly funded early childhood program receiving Preschool for All Block Grant funds or Preschool for All Expansion Block Grant funds shall collect and review its chronic absence data and determine what systems of support and resources are needed to engage chronically absent students and their families to encourage the habit of daily attendance and promote success; defines "chronic absence". Sets forth actions that are encouraged. Provides that, on or before July 1, 2020, and annually thereafter, an early childhood program shall report all the data collected to the State Board of Education, which shall make the report publicly available via the Illinois Early Childhood Asset Map Internet website and the Preschool for All Program or Preschool for All Expansion Program triennial report. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-PRE-K-CHRONIC ABSENCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-05-09HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-001-000
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Education
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105526-19New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback