IL SB3536 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0822
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2018, any publicly funded early childhood program receiving Preschool for All Block Grant funds or Preschool for All Expansion Block Grant funds shall collect and review its chronic absence data and determine what systems of support and resources are needed to engage chronically absent students and their families to encourage the habit of daily attendance and promote success; defines "chronic absence". Sets forth actions that are encouraged. Provides that, on or before July 1, 2020, and annually thereafter, an early childhood program shall report all the data collected to the State Board of Education, which shall make the report publicly available via the Illinois Early Childhood Asset Map Internet website and the Preschool for All Program or Preschool for All Expansion Program triennial report. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-PRE-K-CHRONIC ABSENCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-13SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0822
2018-08-13SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-13SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-23HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; by Voice Vote
2018-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-05-09HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-001-000
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Education
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105526-19New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3536&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3536.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3536eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3536enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0822.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3536sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3536ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3536ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3536_04242018_027000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB3536_05302018_050000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3536ham002_05312018_063000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback