IL SB3535 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act. Provides that for community-integrated living arrangements licensed under the Act, the Office of the State Fire Marshal shall provide the necessary fire inspection to comply with licensing requirements. Provides that the Office of the State Fire Marshal may enter into an agreement with another State agency to conduct this inspection if qualified personnel are employed by that agency. Removes language providing that code enforcement inspection of the facility by the local authority may occur if the local authority having jurisdiction enforces code requirements that are equal to those enforced by the State Fire Marshal. Provides that nothing in provisions concerning fire inspections shall limit a local authority with jurisdiction from conducting local code inspection and enforcement or (rather than shall prohibit a local fire authority) from conducting fire incident planning activities. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMUNITY-INTEGRATED LIVING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21013513Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback