IL SB3533 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that, among other types of contracts, renewable energy resources contracts and leases may be entered into for a period of time deemed to be in the best interest of the State but not exceeding 15 years inclusive of proposed contract or lease renewals. Makes conforming changes. Defines "renewable energy resources". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROCURE-RENEW ENERGY RESOURCES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-04-19SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-12SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-04-04SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3050025-45Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback