IL SB3531 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Requires the Department of the Lottery to deposit any estimated remaining proceeds from the prior fiscal year (rather than any remaining proceeds) after certain payments and transfers are made, into the Capital Projects Fund, on or before September 30 of each fiscal year (rather than on the last day of each fiscal year). Provides that, beginning in fiscal year 2019, the amount deposited shall be increased or decreased each year by the amount the estimated payment differs from the amount determined from each year-end financial audit. Provides that only remaining net deficits from prior fiscal years may reduce the requirement to deposit the funds, as determined by the annual financial audit. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOTTERY-CAPITAL PROJECTS FUND

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-09 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 33 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-18SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1179
2019-01-18SenateGovernor Approved
2019-01-15SenateSent to the Governor
2019-01-09SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-01-09SenateSenate Concurs
2019-01-09SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 033-021-000
2019-01-09SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-01-08SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-01-08SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
2019-01-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - January 8, 2019
2019-01-08SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3
2019-01-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-01-08HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-037-002
2019-01-08HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-01-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-01-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2019-01-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-01-08SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2019-01-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2019-01-07HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2019-01-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2019-01-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-01-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-12-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2019
2018-11-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-07HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-05-30HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-05-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-18HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 15, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Gaming; 013-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Gaming
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2016059.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3531&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3531.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3531eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3531enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3531ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3531ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3531ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3531_04242018_026000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB3531_01082019_003000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3531ham003_01092019_005000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback