IL SB3528 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Extends the repeal date for provisions concerning a program that allows individuals 18 years of age or older to purchase lottery tickets online from July 1, 2017 to July 1, 2028. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOTTERY-INTERNET PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-003-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Stadelman
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Gaming; 011-000-000
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Gaming
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Gaming
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2016057.12Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback