IL SB3528 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Interactive Digital Media Tax Credit Act. Entitles interactive digital media companies that meet certain requirements to an income tax credit in the amount of 30% of certain expenses incurred by the applicant for an accredited production in a taxable year. Authorizes taxpayers to take the credit beginning in the taxable year in which the company has met the investment requirement. Provides for the transfer of credits. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-DIGITAL MEDIA CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 30, 2012 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | To Revenue Subcommittee on Tax Credits |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3528&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB3528.htm |