IL SB3527 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that taxpayers of a qualified historic structure located in a River Edge Redevelopment Zone shall be allowed a tax credit against certain provisions of the Illinois Insurance Code during a 48-month period. Provides that a taxpayer is required to provide a third-party cost certification regarding costs attributable to the rehabilitation of a historic building when the costs exceed $200,000. Defines "phased rehabilitation" and "placed in service". Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RIVER EDGE REDEVELOPMENT TAX

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-001-000
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-25SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 006-000-000
2018-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155409.1New CodeSee Bill Text
355221Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback