IL SB3526 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that the County Board in each county, except in counties having a population of 200,000 (rather than 3,000,000) inhabitants or over, shall, at its regular meeting in June, divide its election precincts which contain more than 800 voters, into election districts so that each district shall contain, as near as may be practicable, 500 voters, and not more in any case than 800. Provides that in counties having a population between 200,000 and 3,000,000 inhabitants, the County Board shall, at its regular meeting in June, divide its election precincts which contain more than 4,000 voters, into election districts so that each district shall contain, as near as may be practicable, 2,000 voters, and not more, in any case, than 2,500 voters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-ELECTION PRECINCTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Election Law
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10511-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback