IL SB3525 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Provides that no later than October 1, 2018, the Executive Director of the Joint Committee on Administrative Rules and the Executive Director of the Legislative Information System shall jointly study and report to the General Assembly on the feasibility and cost of developing an online searchable database system for storing public comment on proposed administrative rules as it is received by State agencies. Provides for the contents of the report. Repeals the section on October 1, 2019. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JCAR-ONLINE DATABASE STUDY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51005-170New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback