IL SB3523 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that every 2 years, each election authority shall submit specified information on the voting equipment used within the jurisdiction of the election authority to the State Board of Elections. Requires each election authority and the State Board of Elections to post the information online.
Title
ELEC CD-VOTING EQUIPMENT
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Karen McConnaughay [R] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-08-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-03-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1-17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3523&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3523.htm |