IL SB3516 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Traditional Asian Healing Therapist Licensing Act. Provides for the licensure of traditional Asian healing therapist, which specifically includes the practice of Asian bodywork therapy, clinical Qigong therapy, and Thai bodywork therapy, by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Creates the Traditional Asian Healing Therapist Licensing Board. Sets forth provisions concerning application, qualifications, grounds for disciplinary action, and administrative procedures. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to set a repeal date for the new Act of January 1, 2031. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRADITIONAL ASIAN HEALING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2020-02-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2020-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2020-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2020-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5804.41New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback