IL SB3514 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children with Disabilities Article of the School Code. Provides that, in a school district with a population of more than 500,000 inhabitants, the principal and all school personnel who are regular members of an individualized education program team shall determine the special education staffing needs of the school based on individualized education program minutes, status of the school's least restrictive environment, optimal scheduling protocols, and other relevant factors. Provides that once a staffing level is set, the school board shall provide full staffing for the school and shall fund the total cost of each position. Provides that the school board may not reduce the special education staffing levels of a school in which the general staffing levels are less than 90% of the State average. Provides that the school board may require more efficient staff scheduling if the scheduling does not impair or hinder any reasonable goals of the school's general education program. Prohibits the school district from banning the use of any measure that would prevent or delay an individualized education program team from adding a service to the program or creating a time restriction in which a service is prohibited from being added to the program. Makes other changes. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SPECIAL EDU STAFFING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-04-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-18HouseArrived in House
2018-04-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 009-000-003
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Education
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105514-11.01aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback