IL SB3514 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Provides that no election shall be directed by the Illinois Labor Relations Board in any bargaining unit after an interest arbitrator has been appointed pursuant to the impasse resolution procedures under the Act, except in the case of fire fighter units. Provides that for peace officer units and security employee units only, within 7 days after the request of either party to proceed to arbitration, the parties shall request a panel of impartial arbitrators from which they shall select the neutral chairman, unless the parties have mutually agreed upon an arbitrator or have negotiated a contract procedure for selecting an impartial interest arbitrator. Provides that in the absence of mutual agreement or an agreed contract procedure for selecting an impartial arbitrator, either party may request a panel from the Board. Provides that if the parties fail to notify the Board of their selection of a neutral chairman within 7 days after receipt of the list of impartial arbitrators, the Board shall appoint, at random, a neutral chairman from the list.
Title
LABOR REL-PANEL OF ARBITRATORS
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Dale Righter [R] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] |
Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] | Sen. Kirk Dillard [R] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2014-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Holmes |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Labor and Commerce; 010-000-000 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Labor and Commerce |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Labor and Commerce; 014-000-000 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Labor and Commerce |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor and Commerce |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Labor and Commerce |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 315 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |