IL SB3513 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the Act may be referred to the Stay of Driver's License Suspension for Child Support Arrearage Law. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Includes a statement of legislative purpose. Provides that in any proceeding to enforce arrearages in child support payments or orders, the obligor shall have the right to petition the court or child support administrative body for an order to stay the suspension of driver's license ("stay order") lasting 12 months after the date of the stay order. Provides that the court or the child support administrative body shall oversee the stay order and shall review the stay order every 90 days to determine if the obligor has started to pay child support if already employed, gains employment, or has made specified efforts to gain employment. Provides that the court shall impose specified requirements. Adds other provisions governing: employment, business, or self-employment income; additional issues, temporary disability or incapacity; support order requirements; termination of stay order for noncompliance; stay order extensions; and other matters. Provides that if the new provisions are inconsistent with Sections of the Code pertaining to notice and hearing requirements currently in place for the suspension of a driver's license for nonpayment, the new provisions control.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-LICENSE-CHILD SUPPORT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 006-003-002
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62557-701.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback