IL SB3512 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Disease Testing for Public Safety Officials and Volunteers Act. Provides that an emergency services provider or first aid volunteer who is significantly exposed to blood or body fluids during the course of performing his or her duties or during the course of performing emergency assistance or first aid may: (1) request that the person to whom the emergency services provider or first aid volunteer was significantly exposed voluntarily submit to testing for the presence of communicable disease; or (2) petition the circuit court for an order requiring that the person to whom the emergency services provider or first aid volunteer was significantly exposed submit to testing to determine the presence of a communicable disease and that the results of that test be disclosed to the petitioner by the Department of Public Health. Provides that the circuit court may enter an order requiring that a person submit to testing, including blood testing, for a communicable disease if the court finds probable cause to believe: (1) the petitioner was significantly exposed; and (2) the exposure occurred during the course of the emergency services provider's duties, or the provision of emergency assistance or first aid by a first aid volunteer. Provides that any person or entity entitled to receive confidential information under the Act, other than the person tested and identified in the information, who violates the provisions of the Act by releasing or making public that confidential information, or by otherwise breaching the confidentiality requirements of the Act, is guilty of a Class B misdemeanor. Effective immediately.
Title
DISEASE TESTING-PUBLIC SAFETY
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Manar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 8, 2014 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |