IL SB3511 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. In a provision concerning the Community Care Program, establishes the following rate increases in the wages paid by vendors to their employees who provide homemaker services: on July 1, 2018, rates shall be increased to $19.89 for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour; on July 1, 2019, rates shall be increased to $21.49 for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour; on July 1, 2020, rates shall be increased to $23.09 for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour; and on July 1, 2021, rates shall be increased to $24.69 for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour. Provides that fringe benefits, including, but not limited to, any paid time off or payments for training, health insurance, travel, or transportation shall not be reduced in relation to the rate increases established in this provision. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMUNITY CARE-HOMEMAKER WAGES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-003-000
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
201054.02Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback