IL SB3511 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. In a provision concerning the Community Care Program, establishes the following rate increases in the wages paid by vendors to their employees who provide homemaker services: on July 1, 2018, rates shall be increased to $19.89 for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour; on July 1, 2019, rates shall be increased to $21.49 for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour; on July 1, 2020, rates shall be increased to $23.09 for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour; and on July 1, 2021, rates shall be increased to $24.69 for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour. Provides that fringe benefits, including, but not limited to, any paid time off or payments for training, health insurance, travel, or transportation shall not be reduced in relation to the rate increases established in this provision. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMUNITY CARE-HOMEMAKER WAGES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 033-020-000
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-003-000
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
201054.02Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback