IL SB3511 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. In a provision concerning the Community Care Program, establishes the following rate increases in the wages paid by vendors to their employees who provide homemaker services: on July 1, 2018, rates shall be increased to $19.89 for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour; on July 1, 2019, rates shall be increased to $21.49 for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour; on July 1, 2020, rates shall be increased to $23.09 for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour; and on July 1, 2021, rates shall be increased to $24.69 for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour. Provides that fringe benefits, including, but not limited to, any paid time off or payments for training, health insurance, travel, or transportation shall not be reduced in relation to the rate increases established in this provision. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
COMMUNITY CARE-HOMEMAKER WAGES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 033-020-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-003-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 4.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |