IL SB3510 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Government Professional Services Selection Act. Provides that a political subdivision may take into account verbal or written estimates of the cost of services for the project. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL GOVT-PROFESSIONAL SERVS
Sponsors
Sen. Pat McGuire [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 510 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3510&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3510.htm |