IL SB3509 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1001
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. In provisions prohibiting a municipality from requiring police officers to issue a specific number of citations within a designated period of time, removes an exclusion for municipalities with their own independent inspector general and law enforcement review authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI CD-POLICE CITATION QUOTAS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1001
2018-08-20SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-20SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-27SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-29SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Police & First Responders Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Police & First Responders Committee
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-25SenateDo Pass Labor; 015-000-000
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-17SenateAssigned to Labor
2018-04-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65511-1-12Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback